Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 949 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14355 Week
» 67371 Month
» 186898 Year
» 3213751 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3785 |
on |
21/09/1938 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
314 |
To Service |
Fri 21/09/1938 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 06/07/1962 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 9 mths , 15 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LDR |
Landore |
4w/e |
23/03/1946 |
ALLOC |
87D |
Swansea East Dock |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/07/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/09/1938 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3785 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
23/03/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LDR) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Landore (LDR) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
06/07/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3785 |
|
|
09/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |
|
|