Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 615 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19526 Week
» 84480 Month
» 287144 Year
» 3313997 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3788 |
10/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08621 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1974 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/10/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
03/1974 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3788 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
15/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08621 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
20/06/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08621 from Landore (LE) |
|
|
06/11/1990 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|