Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2058 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19861 Week
» 72877 Month
» 192404 Year
» 3219257 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3794 |
on |
27/10/1938 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
314 |
To Service |
Sat 27/10/1938 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 26/12/1964 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1965 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
27/10/1938 |
EXE |
|
Exeter |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
81F |
|
Oxford |
4w/e |
02/11/1963 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/12/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
81F |
Oxford |
5w/e |
02/11/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
5w/e |
04/01/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/10/1938 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3794 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Exeter (EXE) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxford (81F) |
|
|
26/12/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3794 |
|
|
08/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|