Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3832 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22743 Week
» 87697 Month
» 290361 Year
» 3317214 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3797 |
28/11/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08630 |
01/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1982 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/11/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
12/1982 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/11/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3797 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
23/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
28/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
11/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
08/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
14/04/1973 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08630 |
|
|
12/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|