Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3390 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16796 Week
» 69812 Month
» 189339 Year
» 3216192 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3797 |
on |
01/12/1938 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
314 |
To Service |
Fri 01/12/1938 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 06/11/1964 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
87D |
Swansea East Dock |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
ALLOC |
87B |
Margam |
3w/e |
29/06/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/11/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/10/1961 |
Caerphilly Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 1420/71, 1506, 1651/68 3702, 4242/65/79/98, 5232, 5618, 6115/45, 6684, 8464/9/86, 9420/57, 9671, 9710, 92221/9. Works Yard: 3682, 3797, 4690, 6108, 9489, 9639, 92238. |
SLS/196112 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/12/1938 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3797 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Landore (LDR) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
06/11/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3797 |
|
|
01/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|