Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2001 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19804 Week
» 72820 Month
» 192347 Year
» 3219200 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D38 |
13/07/1961 |
|
TOPS (45/0) |
45032 |
02/1975 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
13/07/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
14/12/1980 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy |
Cut Up |
17/09/1983 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/07/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
20/07/1964 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D38 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
10/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
08/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
02/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45032 |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
14/12/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45032 |
|
|
17/09/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|