Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3919 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17325 Week
» 70341 Month
» 189868 Year
» 3216721 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3801 |
19/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08634 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/12/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3801 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
04/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08634 |
|
|
22/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ) |
|
|
01/02/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08634 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
20/08/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Carnforth |
|
|