Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 63 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7517 Week
» 10099 Month
» 274732 Year
» 1496297 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3801 19/12/1959  
TOPS (Tops) 08634 03/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 19/12/1959 to Stoke (5D)
Withdrawn 01/02/1993 off Stratford (SF)
Time in Service 33 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys
Cut Up 20/08/2005
Cut At Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Carnforth)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
5D Stoke (New) on 19/12/1959
5B Crewe South w/e 04/12/1965
5A Crewe Diesel w/e 25/11/1967
EJ Ebbw Junction (Newport) w/e 22/03/1975
   Withdrawn on 01/02/1993


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/12/1959 To Service To service as D3801
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Stoke (5D)
   
04/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
25/11/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08634    
22/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ)    
01/02/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 08634 from Stratford (SF)    
20/08/2005 Scrapped Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Carnforth    

prev prev