Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 908 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6513 Week
» 18060 Month
» 417742 Year
» 494329 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3802 26/12/1959
TOPS (Tops) 08635 16/01/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 26/12/1959
Withdrawn 28/02/2007
Time in Service 47 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
5D Stoke (New) 26/12/1959
5B Crewe South w/e 28/01/1961
5D Stoke w/e 12/06/1965
5A Crewe Diesel w/e 05/02/1966
2G Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 02/04/1966
6A Chester (MR) w/e 23/04/1966
6J Holyhead w/e 05/02/1972
CD Cricklewood East w/e 24/11/1973
SY Saltley m/e 30/11/1979
   Withdrawn 28/02/2007

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
26/12/1959 To Service To service as D3802
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Stoke (5D)
   
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
12/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
05/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A)    
02/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (2G)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (Midland) (6A)    
05/02/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Holyhead (6J)    
24/11/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CD)    
01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08635    
30/11/1979 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (SY)    
28/02/2007 Withdrawn Condemned as 08635    

prev prev