Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 909 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14315 Week
» 67331 Month
» 186858 Year
» 3213711 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3803 |
05/12/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08636 |
09/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/12/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/12/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3803 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
18/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
26/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08636 |
|
|
11/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ) |
|
|
27/07/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08636 from Landore (LE) |
|
|
04/06/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|