Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 216 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4853 Week
» 16146 Month
» 280779 Year
» 1502344 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3803 05/12/1958  
TOPS (Tops) 08636 09/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service 05/12/1958 to St Philips Marsh (82B)
Withdrawn 27/07/1980 off Landore (LE)
Time in Service 21 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys
Cut Up 04/06/1983
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
82B St Philips Marsh (New) on 05/12/1958
82C Swindon 4w/e 18/04/1959
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 26/03/1960
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 04/11/1961
82A Bristol Bath Road w/e 29/11/1964
   Withdrawn on 27/07/1980


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/12/1958 To Service To service as D3803
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)
   
18/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
29/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
29/11/1964 Sightings Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop RO 1/1965 Link
09/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08636    
27/07/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 08636 from Landore (LE)    
04/06/1983 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev