Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 597 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6202 Week
» 17749 Month
» 417431 Year
» 494018 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3803   07/01/1939

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Churchward
Class 28xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sun 07/01/1939
Withdrawal During 07/1963
Service Life 24 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86C Cardiff Canton 3w/e 17/05/1952
87F Llanelly 4w/e 06/09/1958
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 21/03/1959
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 18/06/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PDN Old Oak Common m/e 30/06/1948
ALLOC PDN Old Oak Common 4w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC SHL Southall 4w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 21/03/1959
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 18/06/1960
WDN   4w/e 27/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1939 To Service To service as GWR Number 3803
Built at Swindon Works
   
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
21/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 3803    

prev prev