Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 782 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4950 Week
» 20064 Month
» 323254 Year
» 1544819 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3804 11/12/1958  
TOPS (Tops) 08637 06/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service 11/12/1958 to St Philips Marsh (82B)
Withdrawn 09/08/1991 off Ashford Chart Leacon (AF)
Time in Service 32 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys
Cut Up 04/04/1993
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
82B St Philips Marsh (New) on 11/12/1958
82C Swindon 4w/e 18/04/1959
81C Southall 4w/e 22/02/1964
81F Oxford 6w/e 13/04/1964
81A Old Oak Common 3w/e 28/03/1965
87E Landore 9w/e 09/11/1968
   Withdrawn on 09/08/1991


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
11/12/1958 To Service To service as D3804
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)
   
18/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
22/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
28/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
09/11/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
06/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08637    
09/08/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 08637 from Ashford Chart Leacon (AF)    
04/04/1993 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev