Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 755 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14161 Week
» 67177 Month
» 186704 Year
» 3213557 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3809 |
23/01/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08642 |
01/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1970 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
12/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/01/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
12/1970 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
12/1971 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/01/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3809 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
21/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
21/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
01/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
15/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
01/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
01/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
25/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selhurst (75C) |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08642 |
|
|
07/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (EH) |
|
|
31/05/2006 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08642 |
|
|
28/06/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|