Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 400 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 400 Week
» 22906 Month
» 326096 Year
» 1547661 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 3810 on 15/09/1939

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 28xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 328
To Service Fri 15/09/1939
Withdrawal Fri 13/11/1964
Scrapping During 03/1965
Service Life 25 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 15/09/1939
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 09/10/1954
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 28/09/1963
81C Southall 5w/e 24/08/1964
   Withdrawn on 13/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 09/10/1954
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 81C Southall 3w/e 10/08/1964
WDN   2w/e 28/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1945 Swindon Works Locos entering works during October, 1945: 2184, 2206, 2530/41, 2638, 2805/14/72/3/82/8, 2915/33/46, 3025/36, 3656, 3810/3/66, 4016/7/32/40/4154/618/96, 4517/51/64/80, 4603/17/41/53/65, 4704, 4818/31/6, 4925/9/47, 5065/84, 5208/37, 5312/56/81, 5422, 5508/22/66/72, 5718/23, 5902/21/4/8/9/64 6000/6/9/24, 6116, 6378/9, 6437, 6732/9, 6955, 7214, 7719/26/40, 8741/6, 9304/17, 9702/64. L.M.S. 8402/6/14. L.N.E. K3 17. SLS/194602
31/12/1947 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 111, 823, 1007, 1017, 1760, 2280, 2830, 2873, 2902, 2940, 3810, 3856, 4013, 4036, 4062, 4702, 4705, 4854, 4946, 4947, 5024, 5072, 5073, 5092, 5939, 5966, 6310, 6312, 6329, 6350, 6374, 6397, 6866, 6901, 6921, 6938, 6948, 7001 and W.D. 77429. Works' pilots recently have been: Nos. 242, 905, 1713, 2781 an 3561. W.D. No. 73291 was ex Works on 11/12, having been fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and a Wakefield lubricator; the Westinghouse brake had been removed. No. 3215 has been fitted with a repaired R.O.D. tender and was ex Works on 12/12. SLS/194802
09/12/1962 Cardiff East Dock MPD There is no diesel locomotive whatever here and CED is now a full main line shed for the first time in its life ! This must be unique in railway history and the steam phase is expected to last two years as Canton is being demolished completely to make way for a diesel shed and main diesel depot for S. Wales. On 9th December, 1962, the following were on shed-1613, 2875/97, 3662, 3782/4, 3804/10, 4090, 4242/72/82, 5043/74/81/97, 5220/4/5/9, 5749, 6606/37/81, 6813/32/75/6, 6918/32/45/56/72/7/87/95, 7016, 7913, 8425/97, 9426/37, 9629, 92003/236/44/6. SLS/196302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/09/1939 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 3810
Built at Swindon Works
   
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
24/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
13/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 3810    

prev prev