Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 424 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 424 Week
» 22930 Month
» 326120 Year
» 1547685 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 3812 on 23/09/1939

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 28xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 328
To Service Wed 23/09/1939
Withdrawal Wed 16/06/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 25 yrs, 8 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 23/09/1939
CDF Cardiff Canton 4w/e 29/12/1945
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 8w/e 26/03/1955
86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 27/07/1963
81C Southall 3w/e 28/03/1965
   Withdrawn on 16/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CDF Cardiff Canton 4w/e 23/02/1946
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 27/07/1963
TOSTORE   2w/e 07/03/1965
ALLOC 81C Southall 5w/e 12/04/1965
WDN   on 16/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/09/1939 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 3812
Built at Swindon Works
   
29/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
28/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
16/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 3812    

prev prev