Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1428 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14834 Week
» 67850 Month
» 187377 Year
» 3214230 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3820 |
02/04/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08653 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1970 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/04/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
12/1970 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
by 04/1972 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/04/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3820 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
01/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
13/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
04/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08653 |
|
|