Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 867 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5441 Week
» 33399 Month
» 68041 Year
» 1289606 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3820   17/04/1940
GWR (Oil) 4856 m/e 31/07/1947
GWR (Coal) 3820 m/e 30/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 28xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Wed 17/04/1940
Withdrawal During 07/1965
Scrapping During 09/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 25 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 01/11/1952
84K Chester West 4w/e 30/01/1954
84C Banbury 4w/e 14/06/1958
84B Oxley 4w/e 21/03/1959
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 31/12/1960
81E Didcot 4w/e 25/02/1961
81C Southall 2w/e 10/01/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PDN Old Oak Common 4w/e 09/08/1947
ALLOC LLY Llanelly 4w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC BAN Banbury 4w/e 16/07/1949
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 84K Chester West 5w/e 30/01/1954
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 14/06/1958
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 84B Oxley 4w/e 21/03/1959
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 25/02/1961
ALLOC 81C Southall 5w/e 04/01/1965
WDN   02/07/1965
WDN   4w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1949 Oil burning equipment removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1940 To Service To service as GWR Number 3820
Built at Swindon Works
   
1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 4856    
06/1949 Modification Modification: Oil burning equipment removed    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 3820    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
30/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (84K)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
21/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
25/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
10/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 3820    
09/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev