Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 590 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6195 Week
» 17742 Month
» 417424 Year
» 494011 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3822   25/04/1940

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Churchward
Class 28xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Tue 25/04/1940
Withdrawal During 01/1964
Service Life 23 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 18/06/1960
88J Aberdare 4w/e 06/10/1962
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 15/12/1962
88A Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 02/11/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PPRD Pontypool Road 4w/e 22/03/1947
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 18/06/1960
ALLOC 88J Aberdare 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 88A Cardiff East Dock 5w/e 02/11/1963
WDN   4w/e 27/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1940 To Service To service as GWR Number 3822
Built at Swindon Works
   
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (88J)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88A)    
01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 3822    

prev prev