Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 585 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19496 Week
» 84450 Month
» 287114 Year
» 3313967 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3827 |
19/05/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08660 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/05/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3827 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08660 |
|
|
12/06/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
08/11/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08660 from Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
07/01/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|