Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 414 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 414 Week
» 22920 Month
» 326110 Year
» 1547675 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 3834 on 20/12/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 28xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 341
To Service Mon 20/12/1941
Withdrawal Mon 20/04/1964
Scrapping During 11/1964
Service Life 22 yrs , 4 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 20/12/1941
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 30/09/1950
87F Llanelly 4w/e 28/11/1959
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 13/08/1960
81C Southall 4w/e 15/12/1962
83B Taunton 4w/e 29/06/1963
   Withdrawn on 20/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EXE Exeter 4w/e 22/02/1947
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 09/09/1950
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 13/08/1960
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 83B Taunton 4w/e 29/06/1963
WDN   3w/e 04/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during Nov. included: Nos. 905, 1001, 1010, 1413, 1450, 1713, 1799, 2327, 2722, 2781, 2838, 2864, 2868, 2927, 2941, 2979, 3186, 3383, 3817, 3834, 3852, 4039, 4056, 4058, 4073, 4088, 4089, 4919, 4925, 4969, 4979, 4995, 5008, 5042, 5070, 5078, 5336, 5355, 6115, 6136, 7311, W.D. 77291, 77393, 77508, 79278. Of these, 77291/393 and 79238 are ex Marston Sidings and repair in Belgium, and 77508/79278 are fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots during November have included Nos. 242, 905, 1713 an 2781. 'Star' Class No. 4054 EXE was ex Works on 8/11, having been lined out. W.D. No. 78542 GLO was ex Works on 12/11. This is another loco. fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Locos. which have been condemned during November are: Nos. 200, 207, 898, 2783 an 3007. SLS/194801

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/12/1941 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 3834
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
28/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
20/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 3834    

prev prev