Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 819 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5393 Week
» 33351 Month
» 67993 Year
» 1289558 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3838   20/01/1942

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 28xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 20/01/1942
Withdrawal During 11/1964
Scrapping During 01/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 09/03/1963
81E Didcot 7w/e 22/06/1964
81C Southall 6w/e 12/10/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STJ Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 29/01/1949
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 09/03/1963
ALLOC 81E Didcot 3w/e 29/06/1964
ALLOC 81C Southall 3w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   3w/e 19/12/1964
WDN   5w/e 04/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1942 To Service To service as GWR Number 3838
Built at Swindon Works
   
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. SLS 1/1962 Link
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 3838    

prev prev