Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 509 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18312 Week
» 71328 Month
» 190855 Year
» 3217708 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3841 |
06/02/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08674 |
24/01/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/02/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/02/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3841 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
20/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (21B) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (21E) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
24/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08674 |
|
|
05/07/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08674 from Bescot (BS) |
|
|
23/07/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|