Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 955 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14361 Week
» 67377 Month
» 186904 Year
» 3213757 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3842 |
27/06/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08675 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 07/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/06/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3842 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Patricroft (26F) |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (NH) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08675 |
|
|
31/08/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08675 |
|
|
30/06/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|