Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2022 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19825 Week
» 72841 Month
» 192368 Year
» 3219221 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3847 |
on |
08/05/1942 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
28xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
346 |
To Service |
Tue 08/05/1942 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 17/03/1964 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/05/1942 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3847 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oxford (OXF) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
11/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
06/10/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdare (88J) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) |
|
|
17/03/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3847 |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|