Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 70 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 4927 Week
» 16632 Month
» 348121 Year
» 424708 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3850   11/06/1942

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Churchward
Class 28xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 11/06/1942
Withdrawal During 08/1965
Service Life 23 yrs, 1 mth , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86J Aberdare 4w/e 21/02/1959
2D Banbury w/e 07/12/1963
6E Oswestry w/e 10/10/1964
6C Croes Newydd w/e 23/01/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC WES Westbury 4w/e 19/04/1947
ALLOC STJ Severn Tunnel Junction m/e 31/03/1948
ALLOC 86J Aberdare 4w/e 21/02/1959
TOSTORE   4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 30/11/1963
ALLOC 2D Banbury 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 6E Oswestry w/e 10/10/1964
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 3w/e 06/02/1965
WDN   w/e 21/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1942 To Service To service as GWR Number 3850
Built at Swindon Works
   
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (86J)    
07/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (2D)    
10/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Oswestry (6E)    
23/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 3850    

prev prev