Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 746 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5320 Week
» 33278 Month
» 67920 Year
» 1289485 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3851   18/06/1942

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 28xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Wed 18/06/1942
Withdrawal During 07/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 23 yrs , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81E Didcot 7w/e 22/06/1964
81C Southall 2w/e 10/01/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEATH Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC LLY Llanelly 4w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC 81E Didcot 3w/e 29/06/1964
ALLOC 81C Southall 5w/e 04/01/1965
WDN   02/07/1965
WDN   4w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1942 To Service To service as GWR Number 3851
Built at Swindon Works
   
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
10/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 3851    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev