Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1743 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19546 Week
» 72562 Month
» 192089 Year
» 3218942 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3857 |
24/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08690 |
22/01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
24/10/1959 to Brunswick (27F) |
Withdrawn |
12/10/1981 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/10/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3857 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Brunswick (27F) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
22/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08690 |
|
|
30/08/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Allerton (AN) |
|
|
12/10/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08690 |
|
|
24/07/1988 |
Allocation |
|
|
|