Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1330 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19133 Week
» 72149 Month
» 191676 Year
» 3218529 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3859 |
07/11/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08692 |
01/1975 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/11/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/11/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3859 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Annesley (16D) |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
05/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
11/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
01/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08692 |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (LR) |
|
|
31/01/1994 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08692 from Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
03/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Carnforth |
|
|