Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2238 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20041 Week
» 73057 Month
» 192584 Year
» 3219437 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3861 |
21/11/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08694 |
15/12/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
21/11/1959 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
30/09/2008 |
Time in Service |
48 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/11/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/11/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3861 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
19/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) |
|
|
16/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (16D) |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
15/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08694 |
|
|
30/09/2008 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08694 |
|
|