Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 388 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18191 Week
» 71207 Month
» 190734 Year
» 3217587 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3863 |
05/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08696 |
06/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/12/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3863 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
16/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08696 |
|
|