Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1460 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 20371 Week
» 85325 Month
» 287989 Year
» 3314842 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3887 |
31/05/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08719 |
05/01/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/05/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/05/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3887 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
30/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
27/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
01/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
31/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
05/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08719 |
|
|
22/11/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08719 from Bletchley (BY) |
|
|
03/09/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Gwent Demolition: Margam |
|
|