Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4047 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17453 Week
» 70469 Month
» 189996 Year
» 3216849 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3891 |
27/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08723 |
09/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 05/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/06/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3891 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leith Central (64H) |
|
|
28/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
01/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (62C) |
|
|
25/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08723 |
|
|
07/2002 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury |
|
|