Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1353 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19156 Week
» 72172 Month
» 191699 Year
» 3218552 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3899 |
01/09/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08731 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/09/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3899 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08731 |
|
|
21/06/2002 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|