Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 54 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17857 Week
» 70873 Month
» 190400 Year
» 3217253 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3903 |
24/09/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08735 |
06/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
24/09/1960 to Kipps (65E) |
Status |
In Service |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/09/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3903 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
30/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
26/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
29/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
28/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08735 |
|
|
29/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (HN) |
|
|