Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1224 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14630 Week
» 67646 Month
» 187173 Year
» 3214026 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3904 |
24/09/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08736 |
09/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/09/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3904 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
01/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
01/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee West (62B) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08736 |
|
|
07/06/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
12/10/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08736 from Motherwell (ML) |
|
|
11/2009 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|