Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 77 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 3096 Week
» 10280 Month
» 318261 Year
» 1202642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3906 14/10/1960
TOPS (Tops) 08738 05/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 14/10/1960
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
66A Polmadie (New) 14/10/1960
66E Carstairs 5w/e 31/12/1966
66C Hamilton (West) 5w/e 29/04/1967
66A Polmadie 3w/e 29/06/1968
67A Corkerhill 4w/e 26/12/1970
65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/04/1972


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/10/1960 To Service To service as D3906
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Polmadie (66A)
   
31/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carstairs (66E)    
29/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C)    
29/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
13/07/1969 Sightings Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed. RO 10/1969 Link
26/12/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A)    
01/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
05/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08738    

prev prev