Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 689 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18492 Week
» 71508 Month
» 191035 Year
» 3217888 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3909 |
27/10/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08741 |
08/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
23/06/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/10/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
23/06/1973 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/10/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3909 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
15/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
29/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
02/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
23/06/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/06/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
08/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08741 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
16/04/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08741 from Derby (DY) |
|
|
13/05/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|