Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1023 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14429 Week
» 67445 Month
» 186972 Year
» 3213825 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3913 |
22/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08745 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
19/10/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/11/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
19/10/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3913 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
19/10/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/04/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08745 |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (CR) |
|
|
31/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
14/11/2012 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|