Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1799 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19602 Week
» 72618 Month
» 192145 Year
» 3218998 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3921 |
31/12/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08753 |
10/1973 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/12/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
11/1971 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3921 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D) |
|
|
24/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
26/12/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
11/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
27/11/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee West (62B) |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
30/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08753 |
|
|
26/03/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08753 from Motherwell (ML) |
|
|
03/10/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: at Motherwell MPD |
|
|