Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 362 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14405 Week
» 79359 Month
» 282023 Year
» 3308876 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3924 |
27/01/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08756 |
12/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/01/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
08/1971 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/01/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3924 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
31/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ayr (67C) |
|
|
01/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
08/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/09/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08756 |
|
|
31/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
21/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
11/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|