Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 324 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 324 Week
» 7508 Month
» 315489 Year
» 1199870 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3924 27/01/1961
TOPS (Tops) 08756 12/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 27/01/1961
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
67A Corkerhill (New) 27/01/1961
67C Ayr 5w/e 31/05/1969
70D Eastleigh w/e 01/01/1971
73C Hither Green 5w/e 30/09/1971
91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/01/1976
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 21/02/1976

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
10/1971   Air Braked only  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
27/01/1961 To Service To service as D3924
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Corkerhill (67A)
   
19/10/1968 Sightings Glasgow Works visit: In Works RO 12/1968 Link
31/05/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
01/01/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D)    
30/09/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
10/1971 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
12/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 08756    
31/01/1976 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
21/02/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    

prev prev