Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 857 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4405 Week
» 5295 Month
» 313276 Year
» 1197657 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3925 01/02/1961
TOPS (Tops) 08757 04/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 01/02/1961
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
67A Corkerhill (New) 01/02/1961
9A Longsight w/e 30/10/1971
2F Bescot w/e 22/01/1972
TO Toton 2w/e 21/08/1976


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/02/1961 To Service To service as D3925
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Corkerhill (67A)
   
14/07/1967 Sightings Aberdeen shed and environs: On shed - Shunter at work RO 9/1969 Link
15/06/1969 Sightings Corkerhill depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
30/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
22/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
06/02/1972 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the works - Sidings. RO 4/1972 Link
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08757    
21/08/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (TO)    

prev prev