Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 772 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2887 Week
» 25393 Month
» 328583 Year
» 1550148 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3931 10/03/1961  
TOPS (Tops) 08763 05/01/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0810/03/1961
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service 10/03/1961 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Withdrawn 06/10/1989 off Haymarket (HA)
Time in Service 28 yrs, 6 mths , 26 dys
Cut Up 01/10/1990
Cut At MC Metals (at Eastfield MPD)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) on 10/03/1961
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 30/09/1967
64B Haymarket 4w/e 29/01/1972
   Withdrawn on 06/10/1989

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
01/1972   Air Braked only        


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
10/03/1961 To Service To service as D3931
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
28/08/1968 Sightings Aberdeen: Around the area - In yard, south of Ferryhill shed RO 11/1968 Link
17/07/1969 Sightings Glasgow Works visit: In Works RO 9/1969 Link
03/08/1969 Sightings Glasgow Works Visit: In Glasgow Locomotive Works RO 10/1969 Link
01/1972 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
29/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
12/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 08763    
06/10/1989 Withdrawn Condemned as 08763 from Haymarket (HA)    
01/10/1990 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: at Eastfield MPD    

prev prev