Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 530 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6284 Week
» 34242 Month
» 68884 Year
» 1290449 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3932 17/03/1961
TOPS (Tops) 08764 11/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 17/03/1961
Withdrawn 06/05/1988 off Haymarket (HA)
Time in Service 27 yrs, 1 mth , 19 dys
Cut Up 31/07/1988
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) 17/03/1961
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 30/09/1967
62B Dundee West 5w/e 01/01/1972
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 26/02/1972
62B Dundee West 4w/e 28/10/1972
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 21/04/1973
ED Eastfield 4w/e 03/11/1973
AB Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 01/12/1973
   Withdrawn 06/05/1988

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
01/1972   Air Braked only  

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/03/1961 To Service To service as D3932
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
28/08/1968 Sightings Aberdeen: Around the area - In vicinity of the station RO 11/1968 Link
01/1972 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee West (62B)    
26/02/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
28/10/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee West (62B)    
21/04/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
03/11/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (ED)    
01/12/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (AB)    
11/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08764    
06/05/1988 Withdrawn Condemned as 08764 from Haymarket (HA)    

prev prev