Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 794 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2909 Week
» 25415 Month
» 328605 Year
» 1550170 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3933 23/03/1961  
TOPS (Tops) 08765 05/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0823/03/1961
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service 23/03/1961 to Kittybrewster (61A)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) on 23/03/1961
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 30/09/1967
15A Leicester Midland w/e 23/10/1971
2F Bescot 2w/e 29/04/1972


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
23/03/1961 To Service To service as D3933
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
14/07/1967 Sightings Aberdeen shed and environs: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
28/08/1968 Sightings Aberdeen: Around the area - On Ferryhill shed RO 11/1968 Link
23/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A)    
06/02/1972 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the works - Sidings. RO 4/1972 Link
29/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
05/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08765    

prev prev