Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 164 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17967 Week
» 70983 Month
» 190510 Year
» 3217363 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3933 |
23/03/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08765 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
18/04/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 05/1976 |
|
Waterproofed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/03/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
18/04/1972 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3933 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
23/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
18/04/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
29/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08765 |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Waterproofed |
|
|