Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 444 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6198 Week
» 34156 Month
» 68798 Year
» 1290363 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3934 28/03/1961
TOPS (Tops) 08766 10/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 28/03/1961
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) 28/03/1961
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 30/09/1967
52A Gateshead w/e 09/10/1971
91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 30/10/1971
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 16/09/1972

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
10/1973   Air Braked only  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
28/03/1961 To Service To service as D3934
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
14/07/1967 Sightings Aberdeen shed and environs: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
28/08/1968 Sightings Aberdeen: Around the area - In vicinity of the station RO 11/1968 Link
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
30/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
16/09/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
10/1973 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
10/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 08766    

prev prev