Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 776 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 4393 Week
» 16098 Month
» 347587 Year
» 424174 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3935 06/04/1961
TOPS (Tops) 08767 02/02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service 06/04/1961
Withdrawn 31/01/1994 off Stratford (SF)
Time in Service 32 yrs, 9 mths , 25 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
61A Kittybrewster (New) 06/04/1961
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 30/09/1967
91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 30/10/1971
51L Thornaby 2w/e 30/10/1971
30A Stratford w/e 20/05/1972
30E Colchester w/e 17/06/1972
   Withdrawn 31/01/1994

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
06/04/1961 To Service To service as D3935
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A)
   
30/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
28/08/1968 Sightings Aberdeen: Around the area - In vicinity of the station RO 11/1968 Link
30/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
30/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
20/05/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
17/06/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08767    
31/01/1994 Withdrawn Condemned as 08767 from Stratford (SF)    

prev prev