Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 629 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14672 Week
» 79626 Month
» 282290 Year
» 3309143 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3936 |
13/04/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08768 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/04/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
09/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/04/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3936 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
09/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
13/06/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
20/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (BY) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08768 |
|
|
13/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW) |
|
|
24/07/1988 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
31/08/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08768 |
|
|
30/06/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|